+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On October 4, 1984 in the House:
- See H.J.Res.648 .
On October 3, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 21, 1984 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On May 31, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On November 17, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor