+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 6, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4453 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 5, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-730 .
On September 30, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor