+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On December 11, 1973 in the House:
- Private Law 93-39.
- Signed by President.
On November 30, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On November 29, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 29, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On November 27, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 93-565.
On June 6, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On June 5, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On May 9, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 93-188.
On February 20, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor