+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 648.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-361.
On October 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 16, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6202)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4446.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6201-6202)
- Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 636.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-822.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (12)
Stacey E. Plaskett
Type:
Primary Sponsor