+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-135.
- Signed by President.
On December 19, 2005 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2680 Amendment SA 2680 proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Grassley. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.2680 Amendment SA 2680 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Mr. McCrery moved that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 16, 2005 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
On December 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On December 7, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 415 - 4 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4440 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McCrery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 6, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2680
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor