+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H50)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4433.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H50-51)
- Mr. Fitzpatrick moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 369.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-496.
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1582-1583)
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (3)
J. Luis Correa
Type:
Primary Sponsor