+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 26, 2000 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4429 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 21, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 528.
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 106-877 .
On July 26, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 24, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Technology Discharged.
On May 15, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology.
On May 11, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor