+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
On December 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On November 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (34)
Raul M. Grijalva
Type:
Primary Sponsor