+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3453-3454)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3300)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (154)
Type:
Primary Sponsor