+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 292.
On December 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On July 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 29, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 402 - 20 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On July 27, 2011 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 440 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Smith moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia .
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor