+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 21, 1986 in the House:
- House Incorporated this Measure in S.426 as an Amendment.
- Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On March 25, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 297.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 99-507.
On February 6, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 29, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On December 13, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 21, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 30, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 25, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 5, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 26, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
On January 3, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor