+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate.
- Rule H. Res. 76 passed House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 438 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Points of order against consideration of the bill for failure to comply with clause 4 of rule XIII are waived. After general debate the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Commerce now printed in the bill.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 76 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Jack Kingston to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 76 .
- H.AMDT.8 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by the Committee on Commerce. An amendment made in order as an original bill for the purpose of amendment pursuant to the rule.
- H.AMDT.8 On agreeing to the Commerce amendment Agreed to without objection.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 438 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 415 - 2 .
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 76 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 438 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Points of order against consideration of the bill for failure to comply with clause 4 of rule XIII are waived. After general debate the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Commerce now printed in the bill. The Chairman of the Committee my accord priority in recognition on the basis of whether the Member offering the amendment caused it to be printed in the Congressional Record.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-25 .
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.8
An amendment made in order as an original bill for the purpose of amendment pursuant to the rule.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor