+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-92. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7270)
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9297-9298)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4374.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9297-9300)
- Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Greg Walden
Type:
Primary Sponsor