+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 600.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-275.
On September 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3988-3999)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4366.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3988-4001)
- Mr. Rokita moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-424.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor