+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 112-267.
- Signed by President.
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On January 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On August 1, 2012 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 414 - 6, 1 Present .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 31, 2012 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4365 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 30, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 453.
- Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-630 .
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor