+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-499.
- Signed by President.
On October 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 4, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On October 3, 1988 in the House:
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
On September 30, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2571 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2571 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On August 8, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 511.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-792 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On August 3, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 28, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 26, 1988 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-792 .
On July 13, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 30, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 29, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 7, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 24, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On May 5, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 11, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On March 31, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor