+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 26, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On April 24, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USITC.
On December 15, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Commerce, State, USDA, USITC, USTR.
On November 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On November 10, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor