+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On June 17, 1986 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On June 16, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On June 12, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 375.
- House Committee on Agriculture Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 11, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Jun 12, 86.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-632.
On June 4, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 15, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 18, 1986 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On March 14, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Recreation.
On March 6, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor