+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-647.
- Signed by President.
On November 2, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 22, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 22, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- Conference Report 100-1104 Filed in House.
- House Agreed to Conference Report by Yea-Nay Vote: 358 - 1 .
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Conference papers: Senate report and managers' statement held at the desk in Senate.
On October 12, 1988 in the House:
- House Conferees Instructed by Voice Vote.
- House Agreed to Request for Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Rostenkowski, Gibbons, Pickle, Rangel, Archer, Vander Jagt, Crane.
On October 12, 1988 in the Senate:
- House Disagreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate insists on its amendments, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Bentsen; Matsunaga; Moynihan; Baucus; Boren; Packwood; Dole; Roth; Danforth.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2238 with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 87-1. Record Vote No: 366.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2238 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On August 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 888.
On August 4, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 380 - 25 .
- Committee Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute Considered as an Original Bill for the Purpose of Amendment.
- Called up by House by Rule.
- Rule Passed House.
On August 2, 1988 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.507 Reported to House.
- Committee on Rules Granted a Closed Rule Providing One Hour of General Debate; Making in Order a Committee Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute; Waiving All Points of Order.
On July 26, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 484.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Ways and Means. Report No: 100-795.
On July 14, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
On July 13, 1988 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 29, 1988 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 28, 1988 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 23, 1988 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 22, 1988 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 21, 1988 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 31, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor