+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 114-167.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2921-2922)
- Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 433.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2921)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor