+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8246-8250)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4329.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8246-8254)
- Mr. Pearce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 468.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 113-628.
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 11.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House