+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 9, 2004 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-298.
- Signed by President.
On July 28, 2004 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 23, 2004 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 22, 2004 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 666.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
On July 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On July 6, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4327 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Miller moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 24, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor