+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 4, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
- Committee on Judiciary. Referred jointly to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On May 23, 1984 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On May 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and held at the desk by unanimous consent. Until the close of business May 23, 1984.
On May 21, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 15, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 441.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-764.
On May 1, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 3, 1983 in the House:
- For Previous Action See H.R.3233 .
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor