+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 14, 2012 in the House:
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513.
On December 5, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 112-699 , Part I.
- Committee on Judiciary discharged.
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs for a period ending not later than Dec. 14, 2012.
On June 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On May 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition and Horticulture .
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor