+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On September 27, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 21, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources Discharged.
On July 19, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 5, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On April 26, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Credit and Rural Development.
On April 25, 1994 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 21, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor