+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On September 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Natural Resources
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor