+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On September 11, 2012 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 402 - 7 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 10, 2012 in the House:
- Mrs. Biggert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4264 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On June 20, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-544 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 390.
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held and Forwarded to Full Committee by the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Prior to Introduction and Referral A discussion draft which later turned into H.R. 4264 was marked up and ordered reported as amended by the Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor