+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 110-186.
- Signed by President.
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment pursuant to H. Res. 921 .
On December 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 1784 amended.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S.1784 with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- See also S.1784 .
On December 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 6, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 407 - 2 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On December 5, 2007 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4253 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 4, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor