+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
On June 13, 1994 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Studds moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 24, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 293.
- Reported by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 103-526.
On May 11, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 9, 1994 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received from Panama Canal Commission.
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
- Executive Comment Requested from Panama Canal Commission.
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor