+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-172.
On August 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 458.
On June 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4240 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor