+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 4 (Roll no. 375). (text: CR H6288)
On November 16, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 4 (Roll no. 375).(text: CR H6288)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6298)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4233.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6288-6289)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor