+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 110-218.
- Signed by President.
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 689.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4203 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Butterfield moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor