+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On July 5, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 21, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 14, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USITC.
On October 31, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, State, Commerce, ITC, USTR.
On October 25, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On October 20, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor