+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 866.
- Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Oversight and Government Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1028, Part I.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (23)
Matt Cartwright
Type:
Primary Sponsor