+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9814)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4171.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9814-9815)
- Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On December 11, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342.
- Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-460.
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Greg Gianforte
Type:
Primary Sponsor