+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 527.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-696.
On September 18, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (227)
Type:
Primary Sponsor