+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Security.
On March 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On March 23, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 416 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Scarborough moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-29 , Part II. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 25.
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than March 5, 1999.
- Reported by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 106-29 , Part I.
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor