+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 112-185.
- Signed by President.
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 19, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- VACATING ORDER FOR YEAS AND NAYS - Mr. Hall asked unanimous consent that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the motion that the House suspend the rules and pass H.R. 4158 be vacated to the end that the Chair put the question de novo. Agreed to without objection.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4158 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor