+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6127)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4153.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6126-6127)
- Mr. Case moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-599, Part I.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
On August 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On August 2, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor