+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 1991 in the House:
- See H.R.325 .
On February 7, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 6, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On January 31, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On January 3, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor