+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 15, 1986 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 99-795 .
On June 4, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 21, 1986 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Navy.
On May 14, 1986 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Navy.
On May 8, 1986 in the House:
- See H.R.4420 .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 29, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 10, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On March 11, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 4, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 14, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Seapower and Strategic and Critical Materials.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On February 13, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Merchant Marine.
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Navy, DOD, DOT.
On February 6, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor