+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
On June 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 3, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4106 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Davis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 416.
- Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 110-663 .
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
On November 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor