+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-209. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On November 24, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6693)
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H4710)
- H.Amdt.886 On agreeing to the Cleaver amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- H.Amdt.886 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Cleaver. (consideration: CR H4709-4711; text: CR H4710)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4709-4711)
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Mr. Cleaver asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On July 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.886
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (297)
Type:
Primary Sponsor