+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-131.
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4097 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 27, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-457 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 319.
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor