+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5604)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4092.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5604-5605)
- Mr. Kinzinger (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-479.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor