+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On September 9, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hutchinson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 31, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 105-667 .
On July 16, 1998 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 19, 1998 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held and Forwarded to Full Committee by the Subcommittee on Crime Prior to Introduction.
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor