+ − Summary
+ − Actions (22)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology.
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Rural Development, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House House Administration
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
- Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, the Budget, Rules, Appropriations, Agriculture, House Administration, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor