+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On August 11, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 11, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On June 23, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 4, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources.
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor