+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 297 - 121 (Roll no. 135). (text: CR H3119-3121)
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4061.
- The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 780. (consideration: CR H3119-3128)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 780 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450.
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-592.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 10.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
H.Amdt.540
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor