+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On October 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-64.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 1981 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 1, 1981 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 1, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate held at the desk.
On September 29, 1981 in the House:
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On September 22, 1981 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 56.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 97-239.
On September 15, 1981 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On June 26, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor